Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00932
Date Filed2018-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between former director James Comey and the Special Counsel's Office about the production of materials to the Special Counsel's Office. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records, citing Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, which was denied. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-201COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5433687) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons DOJ)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-202LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-20Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsth) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-233SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/3/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/2/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/30/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-095GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 9, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-096NOTICE of Correction to Filing by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 4 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,, (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-047ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-04MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before June 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 4, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/25/2018 (hs) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-228PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Feldon, Gary) Modified event title on 7/5/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Proposed Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before August 24, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its cross-motion for summary judgment and an opposition to the defendant's motion on or before September 24, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and its opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion on or before October 24, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion on or before November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 22, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motions due by 8/24/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 9/24/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/24/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/7/2018. (hs) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-08-219Consent MOTION to Vacate Set/Reset Deadlines, , Consent MOTION for Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 9 Consent Motion to Vacate Scheduling Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the summary judgment briefing schedule entered on June 22, 2018, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall complete its search for responsive records on or before September 14, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report apprising the Court of how they wish to proceed in this case on or before September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 21, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-2810Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-0211NOTICE of Change of Address by Gary Daniel Feldon (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-0312ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall produce to the plaintiff any responsive documents it intends to disclose and a written description of any withholdings on or before November 16, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall notify the defendant in writing of any objections to the defendant's production on or before November 30, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on December 19, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss how this case should proceed and, if necessary, set a briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 3, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-03Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/19/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar