Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJohnson v. Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2018cv00590
Date Filed2018-04-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert S. Lasnik
PlaintiffSandra Johnson
Case DescriptionSandra Johnson submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the investigation of a complaint at the Richmond Beach Rehab facility. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Johnson that it would need additional time to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCenters for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-201COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (Receipt # 0981-5289318), filed by Sandra A Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hornbuckle, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
2018-04-23Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-04-232Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services. (DJ) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
2018-05-213AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services on 4/27/2018, filed by Plaintiff Sandra Johnson. (Hornbuckle, Stephen) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff