Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRYAN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00859
Date Filed2018-04-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffHOWARD BRYAN
also known as PAUL SMITH
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantHORRY COUNTY, SOLICITOR'S OFFICE OF THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, PAROLE AND PARDEN SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-09Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 04/09/2018. (zsb) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, PAROLE AND PARDEN SERVICE, HORRY COUNTY, SOLICITOR'S OFFICE OF THE STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY filed by HOWARD BRYAN. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-04-092MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HOWARD BRYAN (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-073PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/7/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff