Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00955
Date Filed2018-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Solicitor General and the Office of Information Policy at the Justice Department for records concerning communications between Solicitor General Noel Francisco and a list of individuals concerning the Alliance Defending Freedom. Both offices acknowledged receipt of the request. But after hearing nothing further from the either office, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5438960) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Lewis, John) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-242Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-264STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/26/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-05-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/30/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/30/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/30/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Lewis, John) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-306ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Ehrlich, Stephen) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than June 20, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) the status of plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) a proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 31, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 6/20/2018. (mac) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-207PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-08-318Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER. In light of 8 the parties' joint status report, the parties are ordered to submit a further joint status report by no later than October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/31/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-10-019Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Lewis, John) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-02MINUTE ORDER. In light of 9 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report by no later than December 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018.(lcegs2) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Further Joint Status Report due by 12/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar