Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE et al v. ZINKE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00960
Date Filed2018-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
PlaintiffAMERICAN BIRD CONSERVANCY
Case DescriptionDefenders of Wildlife and the American Bird Conservancy submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning Opinion M-37050, which restricted the circumstances under which killing migratory birds would be considered a violation of the Migratory Birds Treaty Act, reversing previous agency policy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. ABC also requested a fee waiver, which was granted. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Defenders of Wildlife and the American Bird Conservancy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantRYAN ZINKE Secretary, United States Department of the Interior
DefendantGREG SHEEHAN Acting Director, United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-241COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5439459) filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, AMERICAN BIRD CONSERVANCY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Summons to Ryan Zinke, # 3 Summons to Greg Sheehan, # 4 Summons to US Attorney General, # 5 Summons to US Attorney)(Glitzenstein, Eric) Modified on 4/25/2018 to remove repeated text (ztth). (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN BIRD CONSERVANCY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (Glitzenstein, Eric) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
2018-04-24Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-253SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to GREG SHEEHAN, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-264STANDING ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 26, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-06-135NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-146ANSWER to Complaint by GREG SHEEHAN, RYAN ZINKE.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-287Joint STATUS REPORT by GREG SHEEHAN, RYAN ZINKE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control further proceedings in this case: (1) the defendants shall file, by November 16, 2018, any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiffs shall file, by December 21, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendants shall file, by January 18, 2019, any consolidated opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiffs shall file, by February 18, 2019, any reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/16/2018; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2018; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/18/2018; Reply in Support of Cross-Motion due by 2/18/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar