Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSt. Maarten v. George et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv03649
Date Filed2018-04-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen McMahon
PlaintiffCeriis St. Maarten
Case DescriptionCeiirs St. Maarten submitted a FOIA request to the IRS for several different forms. The agency provided some of the records, but told St. Maarten that she needed third party authorization to obtain other records. St. Maarten eventually filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantJ. Russell George Inspector General for Tax Administration
DefendantLaura McIntyre FOIA Public Liaison for Internal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-241REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Ceriis St. Maarten.(sac) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-242COMPLAINT against J. Russell George, Laura McIntyre. Document filed by Ceriis St. Maarten. (sac) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-24Case Designated ECF. (sac) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-243PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Ceriss St. Maarten consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Ceriis St. Maarten. (sac) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-05-074TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/7/2018) (sac) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-07NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff