Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00968
Date Filed2018-04-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
PlaintiffDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch and the Daily Caller Foundation submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning communications between the agency and Christopher Steele. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and asked Judicial Watch to modify its request. Judicial Watch agreed to modify its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch and the Daily Caller Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-251COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5441416) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Atty General, # 4 Summons US Department of State)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-253LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION (Bekesha, Michael); Modified on 4/26/2018 to correct filer's name. (tth) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-25Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (jd) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/07/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/7/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-186NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff