Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00976
Date Filed2018-04-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning the agency's changes in sexual harassment policy under Title IX, including appointment schedules for several high officials. DFF also requested a fee waiver for all three requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted DFF's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5443791) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-26Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (jd) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
2018-04-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice to Counsel/Party)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-043RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/2/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/1/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-044NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-06-015ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-286Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-09-127Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-018Joint STATUS REPORT by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar