Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00993
Date Filed2018-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffNATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
Case DescriptionThe National Security Archive submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for 12 cables referenced in the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence's report on torture. NSA also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the National Security Archive's request for expedited processing. The National Security Archive then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-271COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5446091) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1 Certificate, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons CIA, # 4 Summons OUSA, # 5 Summons AG)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/30/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-04-27Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsth) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-273Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (zsth) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-302SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-314NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-315Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall now answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by June 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/1/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 6/15/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time for good cause shown. Defendant shall now answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by June 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/14/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-147STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/14/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer or response to the Complaint due by 6/22/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-158STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to Allow Filing of Amended Complaint by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Zycherman, Lisa) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-159NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Beth Zycherman on behalf of NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (Zycherman, Lisa) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Stipulation, the Clerk of Court is directed to docket Exhibit A to the Stipulation as Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/18/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Karanjia on behalf of NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (Karanjia, Peter) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-1811First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE.(ztd) Modified on 6/19/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2912ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/29/2018. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed the Complaint in this action on April 27, 2018. As of the date of this Order, the public docket reflects that Plaintiff has yet to file proof of service on Defendant, although Defendant has answered the Complaint. The Court directs Plaintiff's attention to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) and Local Civil Rule 5.3. It is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than July 26, 2018, Plaintiff must either cause process to be served upon each Defendant and file proof of service with the Court or establish good cause for the failure to do so. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service due by 7/26/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/7/2018; (See docket entry no. 13 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Karanjia, Peter) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that by July 31, 2018, Defendant shall produce non-exempt portions of five responsive documents and notify Plaintiff of the date upon which it will make its final production. The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report proposing a briefing schedule and indicating whether a Vaughn index will be needed by August 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/23/18. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's production of non-exempt portions due by 7/31/2018. A further Joint Status Report is due by 8/31/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-1516NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. Attorney David L. Sobel terminated. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Karanjia, Peter) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by October 15, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/31/18. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar