Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePiccolo v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2018cv00479
Date Filed2018-04-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Liam O'Grady
PlaintiffJason John Piccolo
Case DescriptionJason Piccolo submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning an investigation of him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Piccolo filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further, Piccolo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-181COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Jason John Piccolo, not paid. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, ) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-182MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by Jason John Piccolo. (acha, ) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
2018-04-303ORDER granting 2 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/27/2018. (dest, ) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar