Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFink v. United States Customs and Border Protection
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityBrooklyn
Case Number1:2018cv02551
Date Filed2018-04-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sterling Johnson, Jr
PlaintiffNeil Fink
Case DescriptionNeil Fink submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning why he was determined to be not eligible for the agency's Global Entry Trusted Traveler Program. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fink filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-04-301COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10394869 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Neil Fink. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hopkins, Shannon) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-302Proposed Summons. Re 1 Complaint, by Neil Fink (Hopkins, Shannon) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01Case Assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-013In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-014This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-015Summons Issued as to United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-176SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neil Fink. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 5/10/2018, answer due 5/31/2018. (Hopkins, Shannon) (Main Document 6 replaced on 5/17/2018) (Guzzi, Roseann). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-187NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Cho on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection (aty to be noticed) (Cho, James) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-218SCHEDULING ORDER: An in person initial conference will be held on 7/2/2018 at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 324N before Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. All counsel must attend. Parties are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 7/2/2018 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 5/21/2018. (Manson, Eddie) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff