Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01019
Date Filed2018-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications between Administrator Scott Pruitt and the agency's ethics officer. CREW also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told CREW that its request would not incur fees. Although the agency had identified an individual as the ethics officer, a memo exonerating Pruitt of charges stemming from renting an apartment from a lobbyist contained the name of another individual as the ethics officer. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-011COMPLAINT against CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5452696) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Shaw, Conor) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-083RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 5/7/2018 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-085RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/07/2018. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-306NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-317Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/31/18. (DJS) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/6/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-07-038Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-04MINUTE ORDER: Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/4/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/04/2018)
2018-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/9/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-099ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-17MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 8/9/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/17/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-08-0910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order by 11/1/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/24/18. (DJS) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/25/2018)
2018-10-3111Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The parties shall file a joint status report by 11/14/18 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the parties propose a production schedule and/or briefing schedule, the status report shall include a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/1/18.(DJS) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/14/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-1312Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar