Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01020
Date Filed2018-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records of all oil and gas pipeline right-of-ways granted by BLM's Montana-Dakotas State Office. WildEarth Guardians also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied WildEarth Guardian's request for a fee waiver and closed its request because it claimed the information was available on the agency's website. WildEarth Guardians filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-011COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5452711) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-022Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/9/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/10/2018. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 5/9/2018 (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-307NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Neil S. Kagan terminated. (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-058NOTICE of Appearance by Sherri L. Morgan on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-059MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer or other response to the complaint is due June 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/6/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/30/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2910ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-2911STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER: The defendant in this FOIA case has filed an answer. It is ORDERED that the parties meet and confer and, by July 20, 2018, shall file a status report proposing a schedule for production or briefing. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/3/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/20/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-2012Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-2513ERRATA by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT 12 Status Report filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Status Report)(Morgan, Sherri) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-09-1814NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelly E. Nokes (Nokes, Kelly) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-1515NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Melanie Dyani Hendry on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT Substituting for attorney Sherri L. Morgan (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before January 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/19/2018. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2019-01-1817Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-18MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case are hereby stayed. Defendant shall notify the Court when necessary appropriations are renewed. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/18/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-3118NOTICE of Resumption of Government Operations and Proposed Schedule by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 18 notice of resumption of government operations, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/1/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-2219Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 19 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/26/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-05-2220Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-24MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 20 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before August 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/24/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/23/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-08-0721NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT Substituting for attorney Melanie Hendry (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-2222Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 22 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a further joint status report on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2019. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/23/2019)
2019-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar