Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01032
Date Filed2018-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning 40 named websites, publications, and organizations associated with the alt-right. The FBI separated the request in a number of individual requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5454359) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-012LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsth) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/09/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/9/2018 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-085ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-116ORDER directing parties to confer and to submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than July 11, 2018. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 06/11/2018. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/11/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-117Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by not later than October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/16/2018. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-10-188Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by not later than December 19, 2018. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/19/2018. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-12-199Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint proposed schedule and status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: the government's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than March 5, 2019; plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the government's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than April 8, 2019; the government's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion shall be filed by not later than May 8, 2019; and plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than June 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/20/2018. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 4/8/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 5/8/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 6/3/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 3/5/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/8/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/8/2019. (tb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-03-0410Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment , Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendry, Melanie). Added MOTION to Modify on 3/5/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the government's consent motion to modify the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that 10 the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule shall be amended as follows: the government's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than May 3, 2019; plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the government's motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than June 3, 2019; the government's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and in opposition to plaintiffs' cross-motion shall be filed by not later than July 3, 2019; and plaintiffs' reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than August 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/04/2019. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 6/3/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 7/3/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/5/2019. Summary Judgment motion due by 5/3/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/3/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/3/2019. (tb) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-04-3011Consent MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Motion Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 defendant's consent motion to vacate the summary judgment briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that 11 defendant's motion to vacate is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the current summary judgment briefing schedule is VACATED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than July 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/02/2019. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-07-0812Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than September 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/8/19. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 9/6/2019. (jth) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-08-0713NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John Moustakas on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Melanie Hendry (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-09-0614Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than the earlier of: (1) 7 days after (a) resolving any disputes over the processing of records or (b) a declaration by either party that the outstanding dispute is unresolvable without Court intervention, or (2) November 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/09/2019. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-09Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another joint status report by not later than the earlier of: (1) 7 days after (a) resolving any disputes over the processing of records or (b) a declaration by either party that the outstanding dispute is unresolvable without Court intervention, or (2) November 6, 2019. (jth) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-11-0615Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/06/2019)
2019-11-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 15 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than December 9, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/07/2019. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 11/07/2019)
2019-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2019-12-0916Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 16 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than January 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/10/2019. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)
2020-01-2317Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-01-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 17 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than February 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/24/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by 2/24/2020. (jth) (Entered: 01/24/2020)
2020-02-2418Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 18 joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than April 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/24/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2020. (tb) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-04-0619Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael G. Seidel)(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the government's consent motion to stay proceedings in light of the COVID-19 pandemic, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties' filing deadline for a joint status report is STAYED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on the first Monday that is two weeks after the resumption of normal operations by the FBI's Record/Information Dissemination Section. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/7/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-06-2220Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay in this matter is lifted; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by not later than July 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/23/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-2321Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' joint status report and the parties' competing proposals for a briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than October 2, 2020; plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by not later than October 26, 2020; defendant shall file its reply and opposition by not later than November 19, 2020; and plaintiffs shall file their reply by not later than December 10, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/27/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 10/26/2020. Response to Cross Motion due by 11/19/2020. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/10/2020. Summary Judgment motion due by 10/2/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/26/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/19/2020. (tb) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-10-0122Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment (Amend Briefing Schedule) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 defendant's consent motion to amend the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than November 16, 2020; plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by not later than December 10, 2020; defendant shall file its reply and opposition by not later than January 11, 2021; and plaintiffs shall file their reply by not later than February 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/02/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 12/10/2020. Response to Cross Motion due by 1/11/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/2/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 11/16/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/10/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/11/2021. (tb) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-11-0923Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than November 18, 2020; plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by not later than December 14, 2020; defendant shall file its reply and opposition by not later than January 14, 2021; and plaintiffs shall file their reply by not later than February 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/10/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 12/14/2020. Response to Cross Motion due by 1/14/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/4/2021. Summary Judgment motion due by 11/18/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/14/2021. (tb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-1824Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 24 defendant's consent motion for an extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than November 25, 2020; plaintiffs shall file their opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment by not later than December 21, 2020; defendant shall file its reply and opposition by not later than January 21, 2021; and plaintiffs shall file their reply by not later than February 11, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/19/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment Motion due by 11/25/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 12/21/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 1/21/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/11/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-2525MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-2726Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages With Respect to Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 defendant's Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Summary Judgment and 26 defendant's Consent Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 45 Pages, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that both motions are GRANTED nunc pro tunc; it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment by not later than November 30, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's memorandum shall not exceed 55 pages. The Court will consider a motion to amend the rest of the briefing schedule when the parties submit a proposed schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/30/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-3027MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Seidel Declaration, # 2 (STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 12/2/2020) Exhibit Exhibits to Seidel Declaration)-)-(Moustakas, John) Modified on 12/2/2020 (tb). Modified on 12/2/2020 (tb). (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/30/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-0128Unopposed MOTION to Strike 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibits to Declaration of Michael G. Seidel)(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 defendant's Motion to Seal and/or Strike and Leave to File Corrected Exhibits In Support Of Motion for Summary Judgment, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that ECF No. [27-2] ("the Incorrect Exhibits") is stricken and the Clerk of Court is directed to continue to restrict access to that filing; and it is further ORDERED that ECF No. [28-1] ("the Corrected Exhibits") enclosed with defendant's Motion is deemed filed as of this date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/2/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-0229NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENT FOR EX PARTE, IN CAMERA REVIEW by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-0430MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a redacted version of the ex parte, in camera declaration should not be submitted on the public record by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-1231Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for an Order to Show Cause by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/12/2020)
2020-12-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of defendant's Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion for Order To Show Cause Re Submission Of Ex Parte, In Camera Document, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file any response to plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause by not later than December 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/14/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/28/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-2132Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 32 the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by not later than January 8, 2021; defendants shall file their Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by not later than February 15, 2021; and plaintiffs shall file their Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by not later than March 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/22/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 1/8/2021. Response to Cross Motion due by 2/15/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 3/15/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/8/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2021. (tb) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2020-12-2833Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for an Order to Show Cause by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 33 defendant's Unopposed Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Motion for Order To Show Cause Re Submission Of Ex Parte, In Camera Document, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file any response to plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause by not later than January 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/29/2020. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/8/2021. (tb) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-01-0834NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 30 MOTION for Order to Show Cause why a redacted version of the ex parte, in camera declaration should not be submitted on the public record (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-0835Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Jeffrey Light, # 3 Exhibit 1-9, # 4 Exhibit 10-19, # 5 Exhibit 20-29, # 6 Exhibit 30-39, # 7 Exhibit 40-52, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-0836Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Jeffrey Light, # 3 Exhibit 1-9, # 4 Exhibit 10-19, # 5 Exhibit 20-29, # 6 Exhibit 30-39, # 7 Exhibit 40-52, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-0837NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar