Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCouncil on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2018cv03097
Date Filed2018-05-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Robert W. Gettleman
PlaintiffCouncil on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago
Case DescriptionThe Council on American-Islamic Relations-Chicago submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning individuals who had applied for naturalization, change of status, and asylum by using form N-400, I-589, and I-485 since April 2008. CAIR submitted an altered request and asked for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency granted CAIR's request for a fee waiver, but denied its request for expedited processing. CAIR filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. DHS upheld USCIS's decision not to grant expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency as to when its request would be completed, CAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship & Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-011COMPLAINT filed by Council on American-Islamic Relations; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14415921. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robertson, Phillip) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-01CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (acm, ) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-022ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Council on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago by Chirag Gopal Badlani (Badlani, Chirag) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-023ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Council on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago by Kalman D. Resnick (Resnick, Kalman) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-03SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (acm, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-06-194SUMMONS Returned Executed by Council on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago as to All Defendants (Badlani, Chirag) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-07-095MOTION by Defendants United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-096NOTICE of Motion by Alex Harms Hartzler for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/12/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-107DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Defendants United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-128MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendants' motion 5 for extension of time to 8/9/2018 to respond to the complaint is granted. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-099ANSWER to Complaint by United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security(Hartzler, Alex) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-1410MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: This matter is set for a hearing to report on status on 8/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-2111STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Council on American-Islamic Relations -Chicago (Badlani, Chirag) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-08-2312MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 8/23/2018. Status hearing set for 12/5/2018 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-12-0313MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Due to the Court closing for the National Day of Mourning, status hearing set for 12/5/2018 is stricken and reset to 12/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-0614MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2018. Status hearing set for 1/30/2019 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn). (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-2615GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2018-12-2616GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 12/26/18: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, effective December 26, 2018, that all civil litigation involving as a party the United States of America, is immediately suspended, postponed and held in abeyance continuing for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this General Order (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 12/26/2018: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 12/30/2018)
2019-01-0817AMENDED GENERAL ORDER 18-0028 dated 01/08/2019: On December 26, 2018, General Order 18-0028 was entered. It appearing that the lapse of congressional appropriations funding the federal government continues, therefore General Order 18-0028 is now amended. (For Further Details See Attached Order). Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 1/8/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar