Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01044
Date Filed2018-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffNATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY
Case DescriptionThe National Law Center on Homelessness & Poverty submitted nine FOIA requests to the General Services Administration for records concerning the agency's efforts to identify properties that were available and suitable for the homeless. The agency disclosed 16 records. NLCHP filed an administrative appeal. GSA denied the appeal. NLCHP then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-021COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5458045) filed by NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A. FOIA request to GSA (May 2017), # 3 Exhibit B. 2017-001067-Varnado-Final Response-18 Sept 2017, # 4 Exhibit C. NLCHP FOIA Appeal to GSA (2017-001067), # 5 Exhibit D. GSA Final Response-03Nov2017.docx, # 6 Exhibit E - HHS monthly report for June and July 2017, # 7 Summons Summons for General Services Administration, # 8 Summons Summons for United States Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 9 Summons Summons for the Attorney General for the United States, # 10 Exhibit Notice of Designation of Related Cases)(Bendernagel, James) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-022NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY. Case related to Case No. 88-cv-2503. (zmd) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmd) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2018: # 2 Notice and Consent) (zmd). (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-144NOTICE of Appearance by James Franklin Bendernagel on behalf of NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY (Bendernagel, James) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-145NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Eiswerth on behalf of NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY (Eiswerth, Christopher) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY served on 5/07/2018 (Eiswerth, Christopher) Modified on 5/18/2018 to correct served date (jf). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-177ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 5/10/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/31/2018. (Eiswerth, Christopher) Modified on 5/18/2018 (tth). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/07/2018. (Eiswerth, Christopher) Modified on 5/18/2018 to correct served date (jf). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tth) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 7 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Attorney General; emailed to ceiswerth@sidley.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile using event: Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney; service date: 5/7/2018. (ztth, ) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018. (Eiswerth, Christopher) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-1810NOTICE of Appearance by Faraz Rahim Siddiqui on behalf of NATIONAL LAW CENTER ON HOMELESSNESS & POVERTY (Siddiqui, Faraz) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-0111NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-0612ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar