Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01045
Date Filed2018-05-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of Defense for records concerning presidential security expenses. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-021COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5458338) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-022LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
2018-05-02Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-043GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/4/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-084SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/9/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 5/14/2018; DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/14/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2018.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-086NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-087ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-09-278SUPERSEDING GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. This Order supersedes this Court's prior 3 General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these amended directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 8 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar