Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01048
Date Filed2018-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning employment contracts submitted to the agency to support H-1B, EB-3, and H-1C work visa applications and the agency's policy for conducting such reviews. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5459492) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-032NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Kirkpatrick on behalf of PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-033Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-034SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-035STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/3/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2018. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-317Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/5/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/22/2018. (kt) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-228ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a status conference on July 24, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21, to discuss the schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall confer in advance of the status conference to narrow the issues for discussion. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/26/18. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/24/2018, at 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-199Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 7/24/2018. Defendant shall provide records responsive to the third category by 8/13/2018; Joint Status Report due on or before 9/17/2018. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-09-1710Joint STATUS REPORT. (McBride, Patricia) Modified event title on 9/20/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/18/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2018. (kt) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-10-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/4/2018. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (kt) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar