Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01049
Date Filed2018-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning various policies of the Office of Civil Rights. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency failed to respond to their requests, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-031COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5459637) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons HHS, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-06-064NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-065ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-07MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. Since the requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not apply, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/7/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties shall confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure due by 6/21/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-216PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint Proposed Schedule) by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) Modified event title on 7/3/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-22MINUTE ORDER: In light of 6 the parties' joint status report, production in this case shall proceed as follows: Defendant shall provide Plaintiff the total number of potentially responsive pages and shall make its initial production (for which it will process at least 750 pages) by July 23, 2018. Defendant shall thereafter make bi-monthly, rolling productions, for which it shall process at least 2,000 pages. The parties shall file a further joint status report regarding the status of production by September 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/22/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2018 (lsj) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-09-287Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 30, 2019. The Court encourages the parties to continue their efforts to prioritize and streamline the agency's review of the remaining responsive documents. Should those efforts result in a need to revise the current production schedule, the parties should feel free to contact the Court prior to the due date for the next status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/3/2018. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-11-138Joint MOTION to Modify Production Schedule Set Out in the Minute Order Dated June 22, 2018 by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar