Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC, v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01052
Date Filed2018-05-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC,
Case DescriptionPublic Record Media submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning current policies for obtaining information from the media. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred it to various component offices. Public Record Media also requested a fee waiver. The National Security Division denied its request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Record Media filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5460438) filed by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Civil Cover Sheet, # 19 Summons)(Yaffe, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-032MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Janet C. Evans, :Firm- Gray, Plant, Mooty, Mooty & Bennett, P.A., :Address- 500 IDS Center, 80 South Eight Street, Minneapolis MN 55402. Phone No. - (612) 632-3456. Fax No. - (612) 632-4000 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5460572. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Janet C. Evans In Support of Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Yaffe, Eric) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-03Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-033ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) Modified to reissue summons on 5/4/2018 (td). (Entered: 05/03/2018)
2018-05-04MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 4, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-044SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(ztd) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically was entered in error and refiled using the correct form, docket entry no. 4 . (td) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-295ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC, . (Evans, Janet C.) Modified on 5/30/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-30NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Certificate of Service was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using the "Service of Process" event (jf) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-306ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2018. (Evans, Janet C.) Modified on 5/31/2018 (zjf). (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/18/2018 (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-05-31NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and refiled by Clerk's Office under the correct docket event.(jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-07-118REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE United States Attorney and Assistant United States Attorney filed by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC,.(Yaffe, Eric) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-129SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to USA. (tth) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-2310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/12/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2018. (Evans, Janet C.) (Entered: 07/23/2018)
2018-08-0911Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-1012MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant shall respond on or before September 11, 2018. Signed by Dabney L. Friedrich on September 10, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1113ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-1214MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before October 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 12, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-10-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC RECORD MEDIA, LLC,. (Yaffe, Eric) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-03MINUTE ORDER. After considering the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 31, 2018, reporting to the Court the status of the parties' efforts to reach an agreement on the scope and processing of the plaintiff's request. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 3, 2018. (lcdfl1) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar