Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01055
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward, an organization advocating on behalf reproductive health rights, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning correspondence between three identified HHS employees and any employees or representatives of specific persons or entities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5462525) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-06-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/11/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/10/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 5/10/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-115ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff's, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 7/11/18. by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/11/18. (DJS) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/11/2018. (tb) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-116Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-18MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 6 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by September 4, 2018 and every 30 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed production schedule and/or briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/18/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-09-047Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar