Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01061
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning classification 190 files, which among other things can refer to the processing of FOIA requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5464061) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsth) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-104RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/9/18., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/9/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/8/2018.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-085ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-12MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by June 26, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/12/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/26/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-266Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2018 to correct docket text (jf). (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-26MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant will file any motion to stay by August 1, 2018; Plaintiffs will file their opposition by September 5, 2018; and Defendant will file its reply by September 21, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/26/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/1/2018. Responses due by 9/5/2018 Replies due by 9/21/2018. (tj) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-317Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-07-31MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before August 14, 2018, Defendant will file its motion to stay; on or before September 21, 2018, Plaintiffs will file their opposition to the motion to stay; and on or before October 12, 2018, Defendant will file its reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/31/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Motion to Stay due by 8/14/2018. Response due by 9/21/2018 Reply due by 10/12/2018. (zs) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-148STATUS REPORT in Lieu of Motion to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 Defendant's Report to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 18, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/15/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/17/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-189Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter on or before December 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/18/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
2018-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/14/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/14/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-12-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter on or before January 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/11/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/16/2019 (tj) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2019-01-1611Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until the restoration of appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the joint status report previously due on January 16, 2019 shall be due 14 days after the restoration of appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/24/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court further as to the status of this matter on or before April 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/8/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-04-0813Joint STATUS REPORT by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 20, 2019, the parties shall submit either a joint discovery plan or, if an agreement cannot be reached, separate plans for discovery. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/08/2019)
2019-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Discovery Plan due 5/20/19. (tj) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-1814ERRATA by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO 13 Status Report filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Joint Status Report)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-1615Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery plan by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/16/2019)
2019-05-17MINUTE ORDER granting 15 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 28, 2019, the parties shall submit either a joint discovery plan or, if an agreement cannot be reached, separate plans for discovery. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/17/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Discovery plan due by 5/28/2019. (tj) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2816NOTICE of Proposed Order and Discovery Plan by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-2817NOTICE of Defendant's Proposed Discovery Plan by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 16 , 17 proposed discovery plans, it is hereby ORDERED that the following plan shall govern further proceedings in this case: the FBI shall provide the declaration Defendant describes in its filing, together with any documents supporting the assertions made therein, by July 1, 2019; Plaintiffs may take a 30(b)(6) deposition of the FBI on one or more of the topics Plaintiffs describe in their "scope of discovery" by July 30, 2019; and the parties shall meet, confer, and submit their respective positions on the necessity for any further discovery, and justification therefor, by August 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/31/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Memoranda due by 8/29/2019. (hs) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-2918Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply in Part with the May 31, 2019 Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/29/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER granting 18 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant may have up to and including July 9, 2019 to provide Plaintiffs with the declaration ordered by this Court on May 31, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/1/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: declaration due by 7/9/2019. (tj) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar