Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01063
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Homeland Security, the U.S. Army, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records referring to "Antifa" and affiliated groups. The Army asked Property of the People to narrow the scope of its request, but then told Property of the People that it had found no records. Property of the People filed an administrative appeal of the Army's no records decision. The Army acknowledged receipt of the appeal. The FBI also told Property of the People that it had found no records pertaining to certain organizations. Property of the People filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Power of the People filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5464096) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-042LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-083SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent). (tth) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-084REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-095SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ARMY. (jf) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-06-056Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before July 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 5, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-07-057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting the defendants' 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The defendants' answer or other response to the complaint shall be filed on or before July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 5, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/19/2018. (JK) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-198NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Allen Haugh on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-199ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
2018-07-20MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before August 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 20, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-0910Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY. (Haugh, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 10 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 10, 2018 (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-09-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposal in their 11 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 25, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-11-0712Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES ARMY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-07MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 19, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED the plaintiff and the Federal Bureau of Investigation, a component of the defendant Department of Justice, shall file a joint status report on or before November 19, 2018 that either proposes a processing schedule for the potentially responsive records identified by the FBI or proposes a briefing schedule for a motion for an Open America stay. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 7, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar