Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER v. BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01064
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffHUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Human Rights Defense Center submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning TRUFONE, TRULINCS, money transfers, and debit cards. The agency disclosed 101 pages of records and referred 125 pages to the Department of the Treasury and 12 pages to the Justice Management Division. The Human Rights Defense Center filed an administrative appeal of the BOP's decision only. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Human Rights Defense Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5464257) filed by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-04Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsth) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-072SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-06-113RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/10/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/9/2018. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 21, 2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-116Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF PRISONS (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 12, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/11/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/12/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by BUREAU OF PRISONS (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-06MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 7 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 13, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/6/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/13/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-08-138ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by August 28, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/14/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/28/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-289PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by HUMAN RIGHTS DEFENSE CENTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Deborah) Modified event title on 8/30/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER GRANTING parties' 9 Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. To avoid simultaneous briefing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before January 7, 2019; 2) Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendant's motion and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before February 25, 2019; 3) Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 18, 2019; 4) Plaintiff shall file its Reply to Defendants' Opposition on or before April 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/28/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/7/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/25/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/18/2019. Replies due by 4/1/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar