Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSchneider v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2018cv00773
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman
PlaintiffAlexandra Schneider
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5401712 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Alexandra Leigh Schneider against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Proposed Summons). (Schneider, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-042Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 9/4/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/1/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 10/1/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-043Summons Issued Electronically as to Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-074Notice Filed by Alexandra Schneider. (Schneider, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-075Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons US Department of Homeland Security, # 2 Proposed Summons US Department of State) Filed by Alexandra Schneider. (Schneider, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-086Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Department of Homeland Security, Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Main Document 6 replaced with Flattened PDFs on 5/8/2018) (joha). (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-06-217Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Department of Homeland Security served on 5/9/2018; Department of State served on 5/9/2018; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/9/2018 Filed by Alexandra Schneider. (Schneider, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-128Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by Department of State, Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-139SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, August 22, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Judge Beckerman's chambers on the 9th floor of the Mark O. Hatfield U.S. Courthouse, 1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-1310SCHEDULING ORDER regarding Rule 16 Conference previously set for Wednesday, August 22, 2018. RESETTING TIME ONLY to 02:30 PM in Portland chambers before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-2211MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 8/22/2018. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Joint Status Report is due by 9/21/2018. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by 11/16/2018. Plaintiff's cross-motion and response to Defendants' motion for summary judgment is due by 12/7/2018. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 12/21/2018. ORDER striking Pretrial Order and Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report deadline. Consents to Magistrate, if any, are to be filed by 11/16/2018. The parties may file written consents to proceed before a Magistrate Judge at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. The consent form may be found in the court's Civil Case Assignment Order (ECF No. 2 , p. 6). For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see https://www.ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/court-info/judges/consenting-to-magistrate-jurisdiction. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. Alexandra Schneider present as counsel for plaintiff. Kevin C. Danielson present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Tape No.: None. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
2018-09-2112Joint Status Report . Filed by All Defendants. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar