Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEstate of Joseph Arleo et al v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictEastern District of California
CitySacramento
Case Number2:2018cv01133
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Morrison C. England, Jr
PlaintiffEstate of Joseph Arleo Deceased
PlaintiffAnthony Pesola Administrator of the Estate of Jospeh Arleo
Case DescriptionThe Estate of Joseph Arleo submitted three FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning the agency's examination of Joseph Arleo and his estate. In response to the first FOIA request, the agency withheld 390 pages in full and 189 pages in part. The Estate filed an administrative appeal and the agency upheld its original decision. In response to the second FOIA request, the agency withheld 110 pages in full and 27 pages in part, but because the Estate had not yet received any documents it did not file an administrative appeal. The agency did not respond to the third request. The Estate then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service by Anthony Pesola, Estate of Joseph Arleo. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7644536) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Rinaldi, Mary) Modified on 5/7/2018 (Washington, S). (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-072CIVIL COVER SHEET by Estate of Joseph Arleo, Anthony Pesola (Rinaldi, Mary) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-083SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Internal Revenue Service* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Mary Elizabeth Rinaldi* *Thorn Law Group, PLLC* *1602 L Street, NW, Suite 401* *Washington, DC 20036*. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-084CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-175SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Estate of Joseph Arleo, and Anthony Pesola served on 5/14/2018. (Rinaldi, Mary) Modified on 5/18/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-176SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Internal Revenue Service served on 5/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Rinaldi, Mary) Modified on 5/18/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L). (Entered: 05/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff