Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIsaacs v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2018cv10886
Date Filed2018-05-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge F. Dennis Saylor, IV
PlaintiffJeffrey Isaacs
Case DescriptionJeffrey Isaacs, a graduate of Dartmouth Medical School who believed he had been retaliated against by the NIH, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning why it did not investigate his charges. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but Issacs was dissatisfied with the response and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-041COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7125802 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cateory Form, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit A-Finn-UI-Testimony, # 5 Exhibit B-Finn-Depo-Term, # 6 Exhibit C-Finn-Depo-Timing, # 7 Exhibit D-Email-to-Kim, # 8 Exhibit E-ERAS-OK-Ltr, # 9 Exhibit F-Finn-Depo-ERAS, # 10 Exhibit G-Ack-Ltr-1-22-18, # 11 Exhibit H-Appeal-Ltr-3-15-18)(Skinner, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/7/2018) (Vieira, Leonardo). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/7/2018) (Vieira, Leonardo). Modified on 5/7/2018 to flatten PDF (Vieira, Leonardo). (Entered: 05/04/2018)
2018-05-072ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-073Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-084MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Keith A. Mathews, Esq. Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7128843 by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Keith A. Mathews, Esq.)(Skinner, John) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-095Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Keith A. Mathews. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-08-306AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jeffrey Isaacs. United States Department of Justice served on 6/13/2018, answer due 7/5/2018. Acknowledgement filed by Jeffrey Isaacs. (Skinner, John) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-057NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of United States Department of Justice (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar