Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01072
Date Filed2018-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning interviews with Tom Blanoff pertaining to former Illinois Gov. Rod Blagojevich's alleged misconduct in appointing a replacement for Sen. Barack Obama. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but told Judicial Watch that it would not process the request without a showing that disclosure would be in the public interest. Judicial Watch provided supplemental information as to why disclosure was in the public interest, but the FBI denied the request. Judicial Watch then filed an administrative appeal, which was also denied. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5466455) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2018: # 1 Notice and Consent) (ztth). (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-104NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1147. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/21/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/20/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/21/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/21/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-156ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) Modified on 6/19/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed joint briefing schedule by June 29, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/15/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 6/29/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-18NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Answer to Complaint; emailed to patricia.mcbride@usdoj.gov, cc'd 6 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document (ztd, ) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-217ERRATA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Answer)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-288PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE For Further Proceedings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' suggestion, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before August 31, 2018; and 2) The parties shall provide a further joint status report on or before September 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/12/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/31/2018; Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (tg) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-289ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by September 11, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/28/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/11/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2910ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . . ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Rogers, Joshua) Modified on 8/30/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-30NOTICE OF ERROR re 10 Answer to Complaint; emailed to joshua.rogers3@usdoj.gov, cc'd 8 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile document with the correct caption and case number. (ztd, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-08-3011NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-0612PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-07MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 12 Proposed Briefing Schedule, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before October 25, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall file its Opposition to Defendant's Motion and Cross-Motion on or before November 8, 2018; 3) Defendant shall file its reply on or before November 28, 2018; 4) Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before December 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/7/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 10/25/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/8/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/28/2018. Replies due by 12/7/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-10-2313Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-24MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by November 27, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross Motion by December 14, 2018; 3) Defendant shall file its Reply by December 28, 2018; and 4) Plaintiff shall file its Reply by January 11, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/24/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 11/27/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/28/2018. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-11-2714Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file its Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-27MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment on or before December 4, 2018; 2) Plaintiff shall file its Opposition and Cross Motion on or before December 14, 2018; 3) Defendant shall file its Opposition and Reply on or before December 28, 2018; and 4) Plaintiff shall file its Reply on or before January 11, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/27/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/4/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/14/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/28/2018. Replies due by 1/11/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-0415MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-1116NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Orfanedes on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1417NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-1418Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Reset Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment by January 15, 2019; 2) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion by January 31, 2019; and 3) Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of any cross motion by February 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/17/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/15/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/31/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-1119MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and its cross-motion for summary judgment by January 28, 2019; 2) Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion by February 14, 2019; and 3) Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion if any by March 1, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/11/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/28/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-2320ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Orfanedes, Paul) Modified on 1/24/2019 (jf). (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-01-24NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 20 Status Report was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled in the correct case.(jf) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-01-2821Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment (and Response to Statement of Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2822Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Statement of Material Facts) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-1423MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of its' Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-14MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 23 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that it shall submit such opposition by February 19, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 2/19/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1924RESPONSE re 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of its' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall file its reply on or before March 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/18/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-03-1825Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED and that it shall file its Reply on or before April 18, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/18/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 4/18/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-04-1726Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia); Modified text and deleted selected docket entry information on 4/18/2019 (tth). (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-04-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED, and that Defendant shall file its Reply on or before May 29, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/18/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 5/29/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-05-2227Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's Unopposed 27 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, and that the parties shall file a joint status report by June 28, 2019. The May 29, 2019, deadline for Defendant to file its Reply is VACATED. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/22/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar