Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01074
Date Filed2018-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Cardinal Bernard Francis Law, who died in 2017. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5466343) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-072LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-07Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-185ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-19MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by July 3, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/19/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/3/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-06-296Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 status report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report on or before October 4, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/18. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2018. (nbn) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 7/18/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-10-027Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 7 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before November 29, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/2/2018. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 10/02/2018)
2018-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar