Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKaplowitz v. Secretary of State
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2018cv00696
Date Filed2018-05-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge G. Kendall Sharp
PlaintiffJonathan Kaplowitz
Case DescriptionJonathan Kaplowitz submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to not renew his passport. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Kaplowitz that it had been sent to the Bureau of Consular Affairs for a response. After hearing nothing further, Kaplowitz contacted the Inspector General's office. He finally filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantSecretary of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-071COMPLAINT/Petition for Writ of Mandamus against Secretary of State (Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number ORL073354) filed by Jonathan Kaplowitz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-072SUMMONS issued as to Secretary of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (issued at intake) (RDO) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
2018-05-083RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 5/8/2018. (copy mailed)(AKC) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-304PROOF of service by Jonathan Kaplowitz. (RDO) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-065ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Petitioner shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response within 15 days from the date of this Order for failure to comply with the Court's Order of May 8, 2018. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/6/2018. (SC) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-126ANSWER to 5 Order to show cause filed by Jonathan Kaplowitz. (RDO) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-127NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jonathan Kaplowitz. Related case(s): no (RDO) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff