Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01088
Date Filed2018-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between the agency and members of the Senate Judiciary Committee and the House Intelligence Committee pertaining to the committees' attempts to obtain the FISA applications for Carter Page. Judicial Watch also submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for the same records. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5470996) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/18/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/18/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-275NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Ann Hunt on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-276Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-27MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including July 6, 2018, to respond to Plaintiff's complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 27, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/6/2018, (tj) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-067ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by July 24, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 10, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 7/24/2018. (tj) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-248NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-249Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by October 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 24, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/12/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-10-1210Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hunt, Laura) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/12/2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/19/2019 (tj) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar