Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDERNESS SOCIETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01089
Date Filed2018-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffWILDERNESS SOCIETY a District of Columbia non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Wilderness Society submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning reports referenced in President Trump's Executive Order on promoting energy independence. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. For some of the requests, the Bureau of Land Management told the Wilderness Society that it had no records. After the agency failed to respond further, the Wilderness Society filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
1849 C Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20240
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR an agency of the United States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5471035) filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed Summons for DOI, # 3 Summons Proposed Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Proposed Summons for US Atty)(Bahr, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Bahr, David) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-06-154NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-225Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 25, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/30/2018, (hs) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2018. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2018. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-028RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 5/29/2018 (Bahr, David) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-309ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-07-3110GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 31, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-01MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 1, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/27/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-2711Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to provide the Court with a proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time To Propose a Schedule for Further Proceedings in This Case, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 28, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 10/12/2018. (gdf) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-10-1212Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to of Time to Propose A Briefing Schedule In This Case by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-11-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time To Propose a Briefing Schedule in This Case, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before November 15, 2018, the Department of the Interior's Bureau of Land Management shall review and process 500 pages and release all processed, nonexempt information to the plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that, on or before November 30, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve the issues raised in this case, including the status of the Department of the Interior's Office of the Secretary's efforts to review and release the nonexempt portions of 95 pages, and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 5, 2018. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018 (hs) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2019-01-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve the issues raised in this case, including the status of the defendant's efforts to review and release responsive records. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 8, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-1814Consent MOTION to Stay (Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 14 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the government seeks to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before fourteen days after appropriations have been restored, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing new deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 23, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-0815Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 18, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve the issues raised in this case, including the status of the defendant's efforts to review and release responsive records. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-04-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 20, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve the issues raised in this case, including the status of the defendant's efforts to review and release responsive records. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 2, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/02/2019)
2019-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-05-2017Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 20, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the status of the parties' efforts to resolve the issues raised in this case, including the status of the defendant's efforts to review and release responsive records. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 21, 2019. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: joint Status Report due by 7/20/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar