Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEQUITY FORWARD v. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01090
Date Filed2018-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffEQUITY FORWARD
Case DescriptionEquity Forward submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning Secretary Alex Azar and his staff's travel and appointment schedules. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Equity Forward then requested inclusion in the news media fee category. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Equity Forward filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-091COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5471065) filed by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 7.1 Certificate, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Summons HHS)(Sobel, David) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EQUITY FORWARD. (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-144STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/14/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-205ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
2018-07-13MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than August 1, 2018. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/13/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/1/2018. (mac) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-016Joint STATUS REPORT by EQUITY FORWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-03MINUTE ORDER in view of 6 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report by October 10, 2018. The joint status report shall set forth the status of defendant's response to plaintiff's FOIA request, which shall begin on August 30, 2018. Defendant shall produce at least 750 pages per month. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/3/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/10/2018. (mac) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-11-02MINUTE ORDER. On August 3, 2018, the Court ordered the parties to file another joint status report by October 10, 2018. To date, the parties have not complied. The parties are therefore ORDERED to file another joint status report by no later than November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/2/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (mac) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar