Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01091
Date Filed2018-05-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffBRIAN J. KAREM
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and reporter Brian Karem submitted FOIA requests to the Defense Contract Management Agency. Karem requested expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, James Madison Project and Karem filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5471601) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BRIAN J KAREM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons DoD, # 4 Summons USADC, # 5 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-09Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsth) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-092LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (zsth) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
2018-05-104GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/10/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-155RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5-15-18. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-05-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/15/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-047MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BRIAN J. KAREM (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-05MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Counsel is reminded the review this Court's 4 General Order and Guidelines and comply with its requirements when filing motions, including Para. 3(b) of the Appendix thereto regarding filing amended pleadings. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/05/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-058AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BRIAN J. KAREM.(jf) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-06-139NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-1310MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
2018-06-18MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iti s hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 7/17/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/18/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/18/2018)
2018-06-2811NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-1612ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-09-2713SUPERSEDING GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. This Order supersedes this Court's prior 4 General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these amended directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 13 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-1114Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/19/2018, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar