Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01116
Date Filed2018-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND
Case DescriptionThe Environmental Defense Fund submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the Waste Prevention Rule. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Environmental Defense Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantOFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantOFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-101COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5474808) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachments to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons For Department of Justice, # 4 Summons For U.S. Attorney, # 5 Summons For Department of the Interior)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-102Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-103MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aladdine Joroff, :Firm- Emmett Environmental Law & Policy Clinic, Harvard Law School, :Address- 6 Everett St., Ste. 4119, Cambridge, MA 02138. Phone No. - 617-495-5014. Fax No. - 617-384-7633 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5475071. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-15ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Aladdine Joroff is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on June 15, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-08-015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/2/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/29/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-018Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-01MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including August 6, 2018 to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 1, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-069ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before August 20, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 6, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/20/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-1710Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-1711NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 14, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 17, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
2018-08-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/14/2018 (tj) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
2018-09-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levitan, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before October 23, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 14, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/23/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2313Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 28, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 23, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-11-0914NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, OFFICE OF THE SOLICITOR, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Attorney Jeremy S. Simon terminated. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar