Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTURY FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01120
Date Filed2018-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCENTURY FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Century Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning the School Eligibility Service Group's oversight of schools' compliance with Title IV. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Century Foundation also submitted a FOIA request for records concerning Administrative Action and Appeals Service Group enforcement actions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, the Century Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5475420) filed by CENTURY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Attachment 9 replaced on 5/11/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-102LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by The Century Foundation (Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zmd) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-143STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/14/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-144SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/17/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/18/18. (See docket entry no. 5 to view document) (ztd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-24NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to martha@nsldn.org, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In the future, you must select all parties that have been served. (ztd, ) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff