Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01123
Date Filed2018-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the National Organic Program's proposed amendment to compost standards. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. CFS inquired several times about the status of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Agriculture, Agricultural Marketing Service
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-101COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, Agricultural Marketing Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5475810) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Kimbrell, George) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/11/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-102MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kellan Smith, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Floor, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5475820. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zsth) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICES, U.S. Attorney's Office and the U.S. Attorney General. (zsth) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-113NOTICE of Corrected Summons by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Summons Corrected, # 2 Summons Corrected)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 14, 2018. (JPF) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-05-154SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
2018-06-055NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-086Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/1/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/1/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, AGRICULTURAL MARKETING SERVICES served on 5/31/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Kellan) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff