Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title Okeayainneh v. United States Department of Justice et al
DistrictNorthern District of Texas
CityDallas
Case Number3:2018cv01195
Date Filed2018-05-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver
PlaintiffJulian Okeayainneh
Case DescriptionJulian Okeayainneh, a federal prisoner, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning oath of office statements for various U.S. Assistant Attorneys. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Okeayainneah filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice Executive Offices of the United States Attorneys, Freedom of Information and Privacy Staff
DefendantNational Personnel Records Center
DefendantNational Personnel Records Center
TERMINATED: 09/27/2018
DefendantOffice of Personnel Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-101New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-102Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-103COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice filed by Julian Okeayainneh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-104MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (mcrd/ala) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-05-10***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu May 10 16:45:16 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-06-075Order granting Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and assessing a partial filing fee in the amount of $43.00 with a balance of $307.00 remaining. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. No process will issue pending completion of screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/7/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-07***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Certified copy mailed to Inmate Trust Account @ BOP Seagoville Thu Jun 7 15:33:08 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-206ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is now directed to issue summons. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the summons and copies of the complaint on the defendant and file a return of service in the case pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 4(c). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 6/20/2018) (rekc) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-21***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Jun 21 09:00:08 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-217Summons issued as to National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (rekc) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-218Business Reply Card signed by USMS; re 6 Order, 3 Complaint, 5 Order For Partial Filing Fee, 7 Summons Issued. Signed on 6/21/2018. (rekc) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-08-019NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ on behalf of National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0110ANSWER to 3 Complaint,, filed by National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0111MOTION to Substitute Party filed by National Personnel Records Center with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0112CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0713Notice of Option to Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are required to complete and return the enclosed form to the clerk. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/7/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-0714Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/4/2018. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/7/2018) (mcrd) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13, 14. Wed Aug 8 08:42:21 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-1015SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Personnel Records Center/Attorney General; served on 7/5/2018. (ndt) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1016SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Justice/ US Attorney; served on 7/2/2018. (ndt) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1017SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Personnel Records Center/US Attorney; served on 7/2/2018. (ndt) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1018SUMMONS Returned Executed as to National Personnel Records Center; served on 7/5/2018. (ndt) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-1019SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Department of Justice/Attorney General; served on 7/3/2018. (ndt) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2720MOTION for 60-Day Extension of Time to file the Scheduling Proposal filed by Julian Okeayainneh (rekc) Modified on 8/27/2018 (rekc). (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2721NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Julian Okeayainneh. New address: represented byJulian Okeayainneh #20515112 BOP Oakdale FCI PO Box 5010 Oakdale, LA 71463. (rekc) Modified Address on 8/28/2018 (svc). (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-08-2822ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff's proposed scheduling order is due within 45 days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 8/28/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
2018-08-2923Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Julian Okeayainneh. (rekc) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
2018-09-0424Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by National Personnel Records Center, United States Department of Justice. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-1225Notice of parties' consents to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Julian Okeayainneh, United States Department of Justice, National Personnel Records Center. (ctf) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-1326ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is the Parties' Consent to Proceed Before the Magistrate Judge, filed on September 12, 2018. It appears the parties have consented in writing to trial of this case before a United States Magistrate Judge in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). It is therefore ORDERED by the Court that this case be, and it is hereby TRANSFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver to conduct all further proceedings and the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), with any appeal therefrom to be taken to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c)(3). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/13/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
2018-09-2727ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING Doc. 11 Motion to Substitute Party . National Personnel Records Center is terminated as a party in this case. The Office of Personnel Management is substituted in its place as a defendant. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 9/27/2018) (chmb) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF #27. Thu Sep 27 12:39:31 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2728Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (epm) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2729Plaintiff's Request for Admission filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (epm) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-2730Plaintiff's Request for Production filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (epm) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-0131SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 12/4/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2018. Discovery due by 2/4/2019. Motions due by 3/4/2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 10/1/2018) (epm) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-01***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:31. Mon Oct 1 14:50:02 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-2232MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery filed by Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Justice with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-2533AMENDED COMPLAINT against Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Justice filed by Julian Okeayainneh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A - Z, # 2 Envelopes) (axm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2534NOTICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (axm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2535NOTICE of Plaintiff's Request for Admission filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (axm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2536NOTICE of Plaintiff's Request for Production filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (axm) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2537MOTION to Compel Filing of Served Paper filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (axm) (Main Document 37 replaced on 10/26/2018 to correct page rotation) (axm). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-0238Amended Memorandum In Support of Judicial Notice of Adjudicative Facts Pursuance to Rule 201 filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (ndt) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0539NOTICE of Clarification of Service of Process filed by Julian Okeayainneh. (ndt) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-0740MOTION to Strike 33 Amended Complaint,, filed by Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Justice with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-1441RESPONSE filed by Office of Personnel Management, United States Department of Justice re: 37 MOTION to Compel (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar