Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY et al v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01129
Date Filed2018-05-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffKNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Knight First Amendment Institute and the ACLU submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Defense and a number of agencies for records concerning policies on prepublication review. The Knight First Amendment Institute and the ACLU also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests and several agencies denied their request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Knight First Amendment Institute and the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

Defendant2255
NATIONAL RECONNAISSANCE OFFICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
1000 Defense Pentagon
Washington, DC 20301-1000
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
950 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL
DefendantOFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
DefendantUNITED STATES COAST GUARD
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DefendantMARINE CORPS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DefendantNATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantNATIONAL RECONNAISSANCE OFFICE
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-111COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, MARINE CORPS, NATIONAL GEOSPATIAL-INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL RECONNAISSANCE OFFICE, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES COAST GUARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5477279) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Rule 7.1 Form, # 6 Notice of related case, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-112LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (zsb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-113NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 16-1256-EGS. (zsb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-124NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 05/12/2018)
2018-05-16Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-165SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-176STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/17/18. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-307RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-308RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-309RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 5/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 5/23/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3014RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 5/24/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3015RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/24/2018. (Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-3016RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/23/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-06-0517MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alex Abdo, :Firm- Knight First Amendment Institute at Columbia University, :Address- 475 Riverside Drive, Suite 302, New York, NY 10115. Phone No. - (646) 745-8500. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5517935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION, KNIGHT FIRST AMENDMENT INSTITUTE AT COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex Abdo, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jaffer, Jameel) (Entered: 06/05/2018)
2018-06-11MINUTE ORDER granting 17 motion to appear pro hac vice. Alex Abdo is hereby admitted to this action pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 11, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff