Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Immigration Coalition v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv04376
Date Filed2018-05-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul G. Gardephe
PlaintiffNew York Immigration Coalition
Case DescriptionThe New York Immigration Coalition submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning Operation Matador, a program designed to combat gangs. The agency's acknowledged receipt of the requests. ICE denied the request entirely under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). The NYIC filed an administrative appeal of the ICE denial. The agency upheld its denial on appeal. CBP told NYIC that it did not have any records on Operation Matador, which was being run by ICE. The agency ultimately conducted a search but only produced 10 heavily redacted pages. NYIC then filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-161COMPLAINT against United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15078445)Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - ICE Request dated Nov. 22, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B - CBP Request dated Nov. 22, 2017, # 3 Exhibit C - ICE Press Release dated June 14, 2017, # 4 Exhibit D - ICE Press Release dated March 29, 2018, # 5 Exhibit E - Business Insider Article dated Feb. 21, 2018, # 6 Exhibit F - ICE Acknowledgement dated Dec. 12, 2017, # 7 Exhibit G - ICE Decision dated Jan. 12, 2018, # 8 Exhibit H - ICE Appeal dated Feb. 27, 2018, # 9 Exhibit I - ICE Appeal Acknowledgement dated March 9, 2018, # 10 Exhibit J - ICE Appeal Decision dated April 6, 2018, # 11 Exhibit K - CBP Decision dated Dec. 8, 2017, # 12 Exhibit L - CBP Appeal dated Jan. 2, 2018, # 13 Exhibit M - CBP Appeal Decision dated April 20, 2018)(Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-163RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition.(Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-164FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) Modified on 5/17/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-165FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) Modified on 5/17/2018 (jgo). (Entered: 05/16/2018)
2018-05-176NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Warren Haskel on behalf of New York Immigration Coalition (Haskel, Warren) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-17***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Terence Yuwen Leong to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name in the 'To' section must include 'care of c/o';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
2018-05-187REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Customs and Border Protection, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-188REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-219ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2110ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2311NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/23/2018) (cf) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-2412SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. United States Customs and Border Protection served on 5/21/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-2413SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint,,, served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 5/21/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. Service was accepted by Haojun Li. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition. (Leong, Terence) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-0414NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff