Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWITTES et al v. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01174
Date Filed2018-05-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffBENJAMIN WITTES
PlaintiffSCOTT R. ANDERSON
Case DescriptionBenjamin Wittes and Scott Anderson, editors of Lawfare, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the 2018 FBI Office and Headquarters Climate Survey. Wittes and Anderson also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Wittes and Anderson that their fee waiver request was under review. The agency subsequently told Wittes and Anderson that their request qualified for the unusual circumstances exception. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wittes and Anderson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-181COMPLAINT against U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5489848) filed by SCOTT R. ANDERSON, BENJAMIN WITTES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Summons FBI Summons, # 8 Summons Attorney General Summons, # 9 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons)(Florence, Justin) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-05-18Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-252SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-06-083NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/4/2018 (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-115RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/11/18. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/4/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/4/2018. (Florence, Justin) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff