Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01187
Date Filed2018-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Campaign Legal Center submitted a FOIA request to the Civil Rights Division at the Department of Justice for records concerning a request from Arthur Gray, the General Counsel of DOJ's Justice Management Division to the Census Bureau to add a citizenship question on the 2020 Census Questionnaire. CLC requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request, claiming all responsive records were protected by Exemption 5 (privileges). CLC filed an administrative appeal and later requested expedited processing of the appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5492490) filed by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 1, 2018 FOIA Letter, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Feb. 28, 2018 CRD Response, # 3 Exhibit 3 - March 27, 2018 CLC Appeal, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Miller, Adam) (Attachment 4 replaced on 5/22/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (Miller, Adam) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/22/2018) (zmd). (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zmd) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/25/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/24/2018. (Miller, Adam) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/25/2018. (Miller, Adam) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/25/2018 (Miller, Adam) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-257NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-258ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 06/25/2018)
2018-06-28MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff's, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 7/25/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/28/18. (DJS) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order are due by 7/25/18. (jth) (Entered: 07/01/2018)
2018-06-299NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M Lang on behalf of CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER (Lang, Danielle) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-2010Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-07-25MINIUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due September 7, 2018. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion due October 5, 2018. Defendant's combined reply / opposition due October 26, 2018. Plaintiff's reply due November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/25/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 10/5/2018. Response to Cross Motion due by 10/26/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/16/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 9/7/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/5/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/26/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-09-0611Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) . (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-11MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due September 26, 2018. Plaintiff's Opposition and any Combined Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due October 24, 2018. Defendant's Reply and Combined Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due November 14, 2018. Plaintiff's Reply due December 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/11/18. (DJS) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 9/26/2018. Response/Cross Motion due by 10/24/2018. Reply/Response to Cross Motion due by 11/14/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 12/5/2018. (tb) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
2018-09-2612MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration (Cooper), # 3 Exhibit (A-D), # 4 Exhibit E)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar