Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW et al v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01189
Date Filed2018-05-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffU.S. RIGHT TO KNOW
PlaintiffCAREY GILLAM
Case DescriptionU.S. Right to Know and Carey Gilliam submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning plans to test for residue of glyphosate in foods from January 2014 through July 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told U.S. Right to Know that it was processing the request. U.S. Right to Know and Gilliam submitted a second FOIA request for records concerning communications between representatives of CropLife America, a trade association of pesticide and herbicide manufacturers and distributors and 12 specified employees of EPA's Office of Pesticide Programs. U.S. Right to Know also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told U.S. Right to Know that it would not incur charges for the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, U.S. Right to Know and Gilliam filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-211COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5492574) filed by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW, CAREY GILLAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-212Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. RIGHT TO KNOW. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-21Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/22/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/21/2018. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-225GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/22/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-06-216NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-217ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-09-278SUPERSEDING GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. This Order supersedes this Court's prior 5 General Order and Guidelines for Civil Cases. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these amended directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 8 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 10/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/27/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-10-119Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/11/2018)
2018-10-16MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file either a further status report or a Processing and Disclosure Completion Notice on or before 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/16/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-11-0910Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar