Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01201
Date Filed2018-05-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
PlaintiffPROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network and the Project on Predatory Student Lending at Harvard Law School submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records submitted as part of the Accrediting Council for Independent Colleges and Schools Part II Submission to be a federally recognized accreditor of institutions of higher education. The agency acknowledged receipt of the organizations' requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the organizations filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-221COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5495616) filed by National Student Legal Defense Network, Project on Predatory Student Lending of the Legal Services Center of Harvard Law School. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Attachment 8 replaced on 5/22/2018) (zsth). (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-222LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by National Student Legal Defense Network (Upton Fulford, Martha) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/10/2018) (znmw). (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-22Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsth) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-223SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsth) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
2018-05-234NOTICE of Appearance by Toby R. Merrill on behalf of NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK, PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL (Merrill, Toby) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-235LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL (Merrill, Toby) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/25/2018) (ztth). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/29/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit a)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-077NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of All Defendants (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff