Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv03050
Date Filed2018-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Northern California submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning contracts between ICE and contractors related to Automated License Plate Reader technology. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The ACLU of Northern California submitted a second FOIA request to ICE for records related to ALPR technology contracts. The agency acknowledged that request as well, but after hearing nothing about either request, the ACLU of Northern California filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-231COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act, 5 U.S.C. § 552 ET SEQ. against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12376593.). Filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/23/2018) Modified on 5/27/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-232Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-253Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-254Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/27/2018)
2018-05-295Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-296Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-05-307CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California.. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
2018-05-318Summons Issued as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 U.S Attorney's Office) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-079***PLEASE DISREGARD, EFILED IN ERROR**** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/7/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-0710CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-0711RETURNED OF SERVICE EXECUTED as to U.S Attorney's Office by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/7/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-1112SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 6/11/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/11/2018) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-1913CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 6/19/2018) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-1914STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 6/19/2018) Modified on 6/20/2018 (ddkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/19/2018)
2018-06-2115ORDER GRANTING re 14 Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/21/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-07-2016ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 7/20/2018) (Entered: 07/20/2018)
2018-08-1317ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-08-1418ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 8/14/2018) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
2018-08-1619ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-1620JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Wall, Robin) (Filed on 8/16/2018) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-2421Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/24/2018. Dispositive Motion due by 12/14/2018. Cross- Motions due by 1/18/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. Responses/Opposition/Reply due by 2/15/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Vasudha Talla. Defendant Attorney: Robin Wall. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2018) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
2018-10-0422NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kimberly Anne Robinson (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-0423NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kimberly Anne Robinson Amended (Robinson, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/4/2018) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-0524Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/5/2018. Defendant shall complete the responses to the FOIA requests by 10/31/18. The parties shall meet and confer in November to narrow the issues. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Vasudha Talla. Defendant Attorney: Robin Wall, Kim Robinson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/5/2018) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-11-1425NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Sean Connor Riordan (Riordan, Sean) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-1426JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar