Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01209
Date Filed2018-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffNATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK
Case DescriptionThe National Student Legal Defense Network submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning alternative earnings appeals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and the agency sent an interim response. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, NSLDN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5496915) filed by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Summons, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL STUDENT LEGAL DEFENSE NETWORK (Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-24Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-243SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-314RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/29/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 5/29/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Upton Fulford, Martha) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-285NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-286ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-07-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff's, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order no later than 8/1/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/4/18. (DJS) (Entered: 07/04/2018)
2018-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-307Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
2018-08-06MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is hereby granted. The parties shall file their Joint Status Report by August 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/6/2018. (lctsc2). (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2018. (tb) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-08-088Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-089NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit to Joint Status Report (ECF No. 8) (Proposed Order) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 8 , the parties are hereby ordered to file another joint report and proposed order September 7, 2018. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/8/18. (DJS) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018. (tb) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-0710Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-2011Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-25MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed order by 10/1/18. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/25/18. (DJS) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018. (tb) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar