Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleStone v. United States Department of Defense
DistrictWestern District of Texas
CityWaco
Case Number6:2018cv00142
Date Filed2018-05-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lee Yeakel
PlaintiffRick Stone
Case DescriptionRick Stone, a retired police officer, submitted FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records on a variety of individuals who served in the military. After the agency failed to respond, Stone filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-231COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 600022957), filed by Rick Stone. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Filing Fee Receipt)(jch) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-23CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-232Summons Issued as to Rick Stone, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENTOF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jch) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-233Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Rick Stone (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-24Text Order GRANTING 3 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Having considered the Motion and the grounds therefor, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nc) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-044Certificate of Service by Rick Stone. All Defendants. (Stone, Rick) Modified on 6/5/2018 (tb). (Entered: 06/04/2018)
2018-06-095PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Rick Stone. (Stone, Rick) (Entered: 06/09/2018)
2018-06-116DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 5 Pretrial Memorandum. Document references an attached document which was not attached. Please re-file the document with the correct attachment. (sm3) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
2018-06-127NOTICE Notice of Correspondence - Corrected by Rick Stone (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Letter from US Attorney)(Stone, Rick) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-07-098ANSWER to 1 Complaint for Injunctive Relief . Attorney Charles Kneeland Cooper, IV added to party United States Department of Defense(pty:dft) by United States Department of Defense.(Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-099MOTION to Produce Vaughn Index by Rick Stone.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Stone, Rick) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-1210RESPONSE to Motion, filed by United States Department of Defense, re 9 MOTION to Produce Vaughn Index filed by Plaintiff Rick Stone (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1211ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 10 Response to Motion by United States Department of Defense. (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-07-1612ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 7/24/2017 10:15 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Counsel for Defendant shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy at julie_golden@txwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-2413Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2018. Court informed plaintiff of potential conflict; If plaintiff chooses to waive objection to Judge Pitman remaining on case, he must file a waiver by 5pm on Friday, July 27. If no waiver filed, case will be randomnly reassigned to another judge in the district. hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(tb) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-08-0114ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Robert Pitman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lee Yeakel for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (tb) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
2018-08-0215NOTICE Joint Notice to the Court by United States Department of Defense (Cooper, Charles) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
2018-09-14Text Order MOOTING 9 Motion to Produce entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. According to the parties' August 2, 2018 Joint Notice, they reached an agreement to begin production of sought materials, and further agreed on the manner in which disputes will be resolved. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Produce is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (md) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar