Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv01269
Date Filed2018-05-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Philip A. Brimmer
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning applications that had been submitted and granted in 2017-2018 for permits to bring U.S. trophy hunted lion parts from Zimbawe and Zambia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Friends of Animals that its request was being place in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-241COMPLAINT against United States Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6120685)Attorney Michael Ray Harris added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Harris, Michael) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-242Case assigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-243SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-06-014ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/1/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
2018-06-045ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference for 8/20/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 6/04/2018. (slibi, ) (Entered: 06/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff