Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01216
Date Filed2018-05-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning the 2019-2024 National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Draft Proposed Plan" as it related to Florida. American Oversight submitted a second FOIA request for the same kinds of records as they related to all other coastal states that had gubernatorial elections in 2018. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but denied American Oversight's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5499458) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-242LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-24Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmd) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-214RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/29/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/28/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/1/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
2018-06-285Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
2018-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 5 . Upon consideration of the defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum in Support Thereof, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before July 2, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 29, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/2/2018. (tj) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-026ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-07-037GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 3, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this action qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before July 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 3, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule/Status Report due by 7/24/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-248Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
2018-07-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties meet and confer on or before August 3, 2018, and file an additional joint status report on or before August 7, 2018, updating the Court as to the status of this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 27, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-07-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2018 (hs) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
2018-08-079Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
2018-08-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional status report on or before September 7, 2018, providing the Court with an update on the status of the case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 20, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
2018-09-0510MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katherine M. Anthony, :Firm- American Oversight, :Address- 1030 15th Street NW, B255, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-897-3918. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5672931. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cafasso, Cerissa) Modified telephone number on 9/6/2018 (ztd). (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-06MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Katherine M. Anthony's 10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Katherine M. Anthony, American Oversight, 1030 15th Street NW, B-255, Washington, DC 20005, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 6, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
2018-09-0711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report discussing a proposed production schedule, including any agreements regarding prioritization of the processing of potentially responsive records retrieved in the defendant's search, and a recommendation for further proceedings, on or before October 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 11, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/5/2018 (hs) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-0612Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 10/06/2018)
2018-10-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall, on or before November 9, 2018, submit an additional joint status report, discussing, inter alia, a proposed production schedule, including any further agreements regarding prioritization of the processing of the potentially responsive records retrieved in the defendant's search, and a recommendation for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 9, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
2018-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2018 (hs) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-11-0913Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before December 13, 2018, the parties shall submit an additional joint status report, advising the Court of the status of the processing and production of responsive records retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 9, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2018 (hs) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-1014NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before January 17, 2019, the parties shall submit an additional joint status report, advising the Court of the status of the processing and production of responsive records retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2019 (hs) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-1716Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 16 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings and for Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendant seeks to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 17, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the continued lapse in appropriations, it is hereby ORDERED that the previously imposed deadline for filing a joint status report on or before January 28, 2019, is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before fourteen days after appropriations have been restored, the parties shall file a joint status report proposing new deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 23, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-0717Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 7, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 8, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-03-0718Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 28, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 8, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2019. (gdf) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-2719NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Attorney Jeremy S. Simon terminated. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-2820Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 12, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 1, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-1221Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-16MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before May 10, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 16, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/16/2019)
2019-04-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2019 (hs) (Entered: 04/17/2019)
2019-05-1022Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on May 29, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 13, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-29Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 5/29/2019. Order to issue via Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 05/29/2019)
2019-05-3023ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall process 500 pages of documents per month. It is further ORDERED that on the seventh day of each month, the defendant shall either produce the nonexempt records identified or notify the plaintiff that no nonexempt records have been identified. It is further ORDERED that, on or before June 26, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 30, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/26/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-06-13NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Status Report; emailed to cerissa.cafasso@americanoversight.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Document was filed in the correct case. (ztd, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-2624Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 31, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 1, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2019 (gdf) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-3125Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 25, 2019, the parties shall file an additional joint status report advising the Court of, inter alia, the status of the processing and production of responsive documents retrieved in the defendant's search. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 5, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2019 (hs) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar