Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv01219
Date Filed2018-05-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning a range of issues pertaining to Administrator Scott Pruitt. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency in response to any of its requests, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
1200 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20460
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-05-241COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5500512) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Townsend, Margaret) Modified on 5/25/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-242Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-243NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-816. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-244REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Environmental Protection Agency, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
2018-05-24Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 05/25/2018)
2018-05-295SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
2018-06-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/8/2018. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/11/2018. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/8/2018 (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-06-299NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0510Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by July 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/5/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-2511Joint MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
2018-07-26MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 11 Joint Motion to Stay Further Proceedings in Both Cases. It is hereby ORDERED that (1) this case is STAYED until further order of the Court, and (2) the parties shall file a joint status report on the status of settlement negotiations by August 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/26/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/26/2018)
2018-08-1512Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/16/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-09-1713Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-1914Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
2018-09-20MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown and nunc pro tunc to September 17, 2018, that the parties' motion is GRANTED. Under consideration of the Joint Status Report 14 filed by the parties on September 19, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/20/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-10-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-23MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by November 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/23/2018. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018. (kh) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar